MA H2085 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize Paul Scott Noe, an employee of the Trial Court, to transfer his vacation benefits accrued during his time in the Norfolk County Sheriff’s Department. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Allowing a benefits transfer for Paul Scott Noe, an employee of the Trial Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2085 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2085.pdf |