MA H2107 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow for emergency hospitalization of persons suffering dangerous or violent mental illness. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To strengthen emergency restraint for persons suffering dangerous or violent mental illness
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5225 |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1269 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S2454 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H5225 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2454 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H5225 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2107 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2107.pdf |