MA H2130 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to giving local boards of health and health departments access to records concerning public water supply systems maintained by the Department of Environmental Protection. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to public water supply records
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4544 |
2017-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2017 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Lenox Town Hall |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H2118 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H437 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2944 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2427 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2428 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H4544 (Replaced by) 2018-05-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2118 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H437 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2944 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2427 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2428 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H4544 (Replaced by) 2018-05-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2130 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2130.pdf |