MA H2168 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2343
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2343
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2343
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement benefits for certain institutional teachers. Public Service.
Title
To ensure fairness in retirement benefits for institutional teachers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied H2343 |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2229 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2348 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1480 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2343 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2348 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1480 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2343 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2168 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2168.pdf |