MA H2192 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to police officer standards and training. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Resolve providing for a “Special Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training” to study and make recommendations concerning the implementation of a Peace Officers Standards and Training (POST) system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-05-26 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2016-04-21 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2016-01-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/04/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H1647 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1646 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3109 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1645 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2841 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H1646 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3109 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1645 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2841 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2192 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2192.pdf |