MA H222 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect consumers using the Internet from identity theft and online predators. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to identity theft and online predators on the Internet
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Golden [D] | Rep. James Arciero [D] | Rep. Thomas Calter [D] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] |
Rep. Martin Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4042 |
2013-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4042 (Replaced by) 2014-06-16 - Reported, in part, by H3636
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H222 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H222.pdf |