MA H2236 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5035
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to patient access to certain health care services. Public Health.
Title
To increase patient access to certain health care services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5035 |
2021-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H1212 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S808 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H2235 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H1251 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S680 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S674
S645 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H5035 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1212 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S808 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H2235 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H1251 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S680 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S674
S645 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H5035 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2236 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2236.pdf |