MA H2242 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4722
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to municipal retirement and health insurance benefits. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement and health insurance benefits in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4722 |
2019-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2164 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2167 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2020
S1512 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1638 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S879 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2618 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2745 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1681 (Similar To) 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H5140
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
S1687 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2618
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2167 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2020
S1512 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1638 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S879 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2618 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2745 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1681 (Similar To) 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H5140
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
S1687 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2618
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2242 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2242.pdf |