MA H2250 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5202
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the administration of opioid maintenance treatment in the prescription monitoring program. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the prescription monitoring program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5202 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1451 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3052
H5202 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5202 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2250 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2250.pdf |