MA H2261 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to permitting the court to expunge criminal charges from the records of innocent persons. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to permitting the court to expunge the records of innocent persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2170 |
2017-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S927 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S926 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H978 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S767 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1647 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S766 (Similar To) 2018-04-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S816 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S864 (Similar To) 2018-04-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H896 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S769 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
S926 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H978 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S767 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1647 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S766 (Similar To) 2018-04-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S816 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S864 (Similar To) 2018-04-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H896 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S769 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2261 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2261.pdf |