MA H2293 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 20, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 20, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to employment agreements concerning engaging in activities directly or indirectly competitive with the employer
Title
Relative to noncompetition agreements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 20, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, June 21, 2012 |
2011-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2293 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12710&generalCourtId=1 |