MA H2319 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5222
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to public health dental hygienists. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the sustainability of public health dental hygienists through adequate reimbursements
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Hogan [D] | Sen. Harriette Chandler [D] | Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5222 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-09 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-03-09 | House | Accompanied by S1375 |
2021-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1375 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H2319
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
H5222 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
H5222 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2319 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2319.pdf |