MA H2328 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Markey of Dartmouth, a petition of Christopher M. Markey that the town of Dartmouth be authorized to create a trust fund for police officer medical benefits. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To create a trust fund for police officer medical benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-03-28 | House | Enacted |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-12-15 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-10-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-09-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-04-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/12/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2328 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13474&generalCourtId=1 |