MA H2340 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5197
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5197
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5197
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to limited service clinics. Public Health.
Title
Relative to limited service clinics
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Thomas Walsh [D] | Rep. William Galvin [D] | Rep. John Barrett [D] |
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Susan Moran [D] | Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5197 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2229 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H5197 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5197 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2340 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2340.pdf |