MA H237 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4335
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4335
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4335
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the issuance and sale of sports and entertainment tickets. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To reform the issuance and sale of sports and entertainment tickets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4335 |
2016-03-16 | House | House concurred |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 15, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-11-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4335 (Replaced by) 2016-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3049 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
H2793 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2374 (Similar To) 2015-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1499 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2375 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3049 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
H2793 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2374 (Similar To) 2015-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1499 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2375 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H237 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H237.pdf |