MA H2390 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing the Massachusetts child AMBER Alert plan to assist in the recovery of abducted children through prompt notification. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts child AMBER Alert plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-05-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2011 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2390 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13160&generalCourtId=1 |