MA H2399 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4557
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing equitable access to behavioral health services for MassHealth consumers. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Providing equitable access to behavioral health services for MassHealth consumers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4557 |
2017-05-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S648 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H623 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H606 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S606 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
S1164 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4557 (Replaced by) 2018-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H623 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H606 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S606 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
S1164 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4557 (Replaced by) 2018-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2399 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2399.pdf |