MA H2403 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5035
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of "covered drug" under the program financed by pharmaceutical product manufacturers or groups of manufacturers to collect, secure, transport and safely dispose of unwanted drugs. Public Health.
Title
To establish a sharps stewardship program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5035 |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H5035 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2403 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2403.pdf |