MA H2447 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4528
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the fees charged for the certification of firefighters as emergency medical technicians. Public Health.
Title
Relative to firefighters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4528 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-09 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-11-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1455 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1375 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1537 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1536
H1849 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1388 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1375 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1537 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1536
H1849 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1388 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2447 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2447.pdf |