MA H2458 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5220
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5220
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5220
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the penalties for false distress calls. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to penalties for false distress calls
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5220 |
2021-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S576 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1742 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1631 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1117 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H5220 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1647 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1742 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1631 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1117 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H5220 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1647 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2458 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2458.pdf |