MA H250 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require physicians and physicians assistants to certify being trained in eating disorders when applying to renew their licenses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to training for certain medical professional about eating disorders
Sponsors
Rep. Bradford Hill [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3429 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S681 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1137 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S843 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3388
S558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3429 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S681 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1137 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S843 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3388
S558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H250 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H250.pdf |