MA H2500 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4437
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to providing for a tax deduction of health insurance payments from gross income for self employed individuals. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the deduction of health insurance payments from gross income for self employed individuals
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Rep. Kevin Honan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4437 |
2013-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2013 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4437 (Replaced by) 2014-11-13 - Reported, in part, by H3537
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2500 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2500.pdf |