MA H2515 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 148 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 148 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to disability benefits for incapacitated public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to disability benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 364 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - House On adoption of amendment #1 Yea and Nay No. 363 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - House On adoption of amendment #1 Yea and Nay No. 363 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 148 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-12 | House | Enacted |
2018-07-12 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2018-07-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-09 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-09 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-05-30 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 364) |
2018-05-30 | House | Amendment 1 adopted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 363) |
2018-05-30 | House | Read third |
2018-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-03-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2515 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2515.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov//Journal/House/190/RollCalls/hj05302018_RollCalls.pdf |