MA H2522 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the cost of living adjustment for public retirees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the cost of living adjustment for public retirees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-04-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1474 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1400 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1417 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1450 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2526 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1322 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1390 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1422 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1447 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1435 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
S1400 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1417 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1450 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2526 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1322 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1390 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1422 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1447 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1435 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2522 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2522.pdf |