MA H2543 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5353
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to primary enforcement of seatbelt violations. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to primary enforcement of seatbelt violations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5353 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 18, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H5353 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2543 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2543.pdf |