MA H255 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4678
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the authority of school districts to be exempt from a certain standardized exam. Education.
Title
Relative to the common core opt out for school districts
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
Sen. Kathleen O'Connor Ives [D] | Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4678 |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S262 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
H251 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H249 (Similar To) 2017-05-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S264 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3482 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H258 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H2047 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H4678 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H251 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H249 (Similar To) 2017-05-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S264 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3482 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H258 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H2047 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H4678 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H255 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H255.pdf |