MA H2558 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Barrett of North Adams, a petition of John Barrett, III that the the teachers' retirement system permit Rebecca J. Vanderstelt to purchase certain creditable service for teaching service in the United States Virgin Islands. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement benefits for Rebecca J. Vanderstelt
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2637 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2786 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1664 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1776 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1731 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2426 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
H2589 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2786 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1664 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1776 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1731 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2426 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
H2589 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2558 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2558.pdf |