MA H2566 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to motion pictures filmed in the Commonwealth. Revenue.
Title
Promoting Massachusetts film production
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2566 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2566.pdf |