MA H258 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4463
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the fishing and sale of Atlantic Striped Bass. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the economic value and revenue generation of the atlantic striped bass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4463 |
2012-02-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2012 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4463 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H258 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9569&generalCourtId=1 |