MA H258 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retail sale of certain malt beverages. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Expanding access to craft beer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S175 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2592
S104 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2829
H235 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S175 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2592
S104 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2829
H235 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H258 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H258.pdf |