MA H2631 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2390
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the value of agricultural and horticultural land for tax purposes. Revenue.
Title
Relative to expanding agricultural land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-03-04 | House | Accompanied by H2390 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2595 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2601 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2559 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2658
H2560 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2535 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied H2653
S1727 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1765 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1702 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1703 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S527 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - New draft substituted, see S2520
H4244 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 357 of the Acts of 2020
S2439 (Similar To) 2020-07-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2390 (Replaces) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2631
H2601 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2559 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2658
H2560 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2535 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied H2653
S1727 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1765 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1702 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1703 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S527 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - New draft substituted, see S2520
H4244 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 357 of the Acts of 2020
S2439 (Similar To) 2020-07-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2390 (Replaces) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2631
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2631 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2631.pdf |