MA S527 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2520
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - New draft substituted, see S2520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - New draft substituted, see S2520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize certain provisions of the agricultural preservation restriction program. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To modernize certain provisions of the agricultural preservation restriction program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2520 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2520 |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2649 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H59 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1413 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S716 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2886 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H3535 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Passed to be engrossed - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 79)
S407 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H3905 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Adopted, see H3535
S2300 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - New Draft substituted, see S2915
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2520 (Replaced by) 2020-02-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H59 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1413 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S716 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2886 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H3535 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Passed to be engrossed - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 79)
S407 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H3905 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Adopted, see H3535
S2300 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - New Draft substituted, see S2915
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2520 (Replaced by) 2020-02-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S527 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S527.pdf |