MA H264 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Straus of Mattapoisett, a petition of William M. Straus and Sean Garballey for the establishment of a cranberry nutrient management special commission (including members of the General Court) to make an investigation and study of protecting the water quality in the South coastal and Cape Cod drainage basins. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to create cranberry nutrient management study commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-05-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint committee on Rules |
2011-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2011 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H264 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7848&generalCourtId=1 |