MA H2668 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide procurement preference to vendors that carry cybersecurity insurance. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to cyber procurements
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
Rep. Sheila Harrington [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4481 |
2017-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H182 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3331 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H182 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3331 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2668 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2668.pdf |