MA H267 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4685
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to develop an elective high school course on labor law and workers’ rights. Education.
Title
Relative to civics course curriculum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4685 |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H240 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H2022 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H261 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H315 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H2039 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H4685 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2022 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H261 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H315 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H2039 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H4685 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H267 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H267.pdf |