MA H2689 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate certain law enforcement records as public records. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To provide for the public inspection of records made or received by special state police officers at educational institutions
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2751 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S911 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1127 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S1825 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2676 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1838 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2779 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S911 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1127 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S1825 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2676 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1838 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2779 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2689 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2689.pdf |