MA H2704 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Clinton be authorized to continue the employment of police chief Mark R. Laverdure. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Clinton to continue the employment of police chief Mark R. Laverdure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-07-08 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-06-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-06-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2182 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2022
H2183 (Similar To) 2022-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2022
H418 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5438
H3740 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H4247 (Similar To) 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 382 of the Acts of 2022
H4246 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4669
H3896 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2021
H2183 (Similar To) 2022-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2022
H418 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5438
H3740 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H4247 (Similar To) 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 382 of the Acts of 2022
H4246 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4669
H3896 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2704 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2704.pdf |