MA H4246 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4669
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4669
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4669
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Clinton be authorized to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Clinton to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4669 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday December 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H3714 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4669 (Replaced by) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 237 of the Acts of 2022
H3896 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2021
H418 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5438
H3740 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H5438 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H3714 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4669 (Replaced by) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 237 of the Acts of 2022
H3896 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2021
H418 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5438
H3740 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H5438 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4246 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4246.pdf |