MA H2710 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the abatement of certain real estate taxes for surviving spouses or guardians of children of emergency first responders or corrections officers killed in the line of duty. Revenue.
Title
Relating to guardians of surviving children of emergency first responders
Sponsors
Rep. David Biele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2832 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
H3906 (Similar To) 2023-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2023
H4458 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H3906 (Similar To) 2023-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2023
H4458 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2710 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2710.pdf |