MA H4458 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4870
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4870
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4870
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to real estate tax abatements for certain blind persons. Revenue.
Title
Relative to blind persons' real estate tax abatement
Sponsors
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. Francisco Paulino [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4870 |
2024-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-04-16 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Revenue |
2024-04-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-16 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3906 (Similar To) 2023-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2023
H2710 (Similar To) 2024-09-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4870 (Replaced by) 2024-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2710 (Similar To) 2024-09-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4870 (Replaced by) 2024-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4458 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4458.pdf |