MA H2741 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the purchase of tunnel safety insurance by the Executive Office of Transportation. Transportation.
Title
Concerning tunnel safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-11-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/17 from 3:00PM-5:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S578 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H588 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H497 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H587 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4333
H498 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H34 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H4110 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2547 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4921 (Similar To) 2018-10-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
H5021 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Passed to be engrossed
H5026 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Passed to be engrossed
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H588 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H497 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H587 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4333
H498 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H34 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H4110 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2547 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4921 (Similar To) 2018-10-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
H5021 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Passed to be engrossed
H5026 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Passed to be engrossed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2741 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2741.pdf |