MA H2755 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide certain creditable service for retirement purposes to Robert Iantosca, an employee of the Department of Revenue. Public Service.
Title
Relative to creditable service for Robert Iantosca, an employee of the Department of Revenue
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Philips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-01-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2640 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2576 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S1657 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4443 (Similar To) 2022-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2022
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2576 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S1657 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4443 (Similar To) 2022-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2022
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2755 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2755.pdf |