MA H2766 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to direct the State Auditor to conduct annual audits of credit cards issued on behalf of state agencies. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to agency credit cards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4102 |
2015-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4102 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Reported, in part, by H3889
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2766 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2766.pdf |