MA H2779 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to effective dates of rules and regulations established by the traffic commission of the city of Woburn. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the traffic commission in the city of Woburn
Sponsors
Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. Jay Kaufman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-10-04 | House | Enacted |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-07-24 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-06-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-06-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2779 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2779.pdf |