MA H2791 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1881
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-16 - Accompanied S1881
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-16 - Accompanied S1881
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain parcels of land in city of Salem. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Directing the division of capital asset management to convey certain parcels of land in Salem
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-16 | Senate | Accompanied S1881 |
2019-03-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1881 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - New draft substituted, see S2584
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2791 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2791.pdf |