MA H2810 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4143
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act providing for the conveyance of certain land by the Commonwealth of Massachusetts along I-95. By Mr. Galvin of Canton, a petition of William C. Galvin that the Secretary for Administration and Finance be directed to designate the use of certain land abutting Route 95 or Dedham Street in the town of Canton for civic, recreational or social purposes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Providing for the conveyance of certain land by the Commonwealth of Massachusetts along I-95.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4143 |
2013-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4143 (Replaced by) 2014-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2810 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2810.pdf |