MA H2810 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the seal and motto of the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Resolve providing for the creation of a special commission relative to the seal and motto of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2016-04-19 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2810 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2810.pdf |