MA H2816 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4102
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the open meeting law by defining a “public internet discussion” and setting requirements for members of a public body to discuss matters before it in a “public internet discussion”. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To permit enhanced public access to deliberations of public bodies and to permit improved efficiency of public bodies
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Sannicandro [D] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] |
Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Leah Cole [R] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. Jay Kaufman [D] |
Sen. Karen Spilka [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4102 |
2015-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4102 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Reported, in part, by H3889
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2816 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2816.pdf |