MA H2830 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4584
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the certification of targeted employment area districts in gateway municipalities. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Promoting capital investment in targeted employment areas
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] | Rep. Robert Koczera [D] | Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
Rep. Linda Campbell [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4584 |
2017-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H3461 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4584 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4584 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2830 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2830.pdf |