MA H2850 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to improving public safety in excavation and enhancing the “Dig Safe” Program, so-called. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to Improving Public Safety in Excavation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H323 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H807 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1211 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1212 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4734 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 451 of the Acts of 2016
H807 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1211 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1212 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4734 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 451 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2850 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2850.pdf |